Financial history CAMPHILL FAMILIES AND FRIENDS

Charity number: 1078930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.76k £5.87k £6.55k £7.27k £6.91k
Total expenditure £15.41k £7.31k £3.61k £25.53k £1.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A