Woodcroft Academy Leek PTFA

Charity number: 1078839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.52k £6.87k £6.06k £5.27k £2.90k
Total expenditure £6.07k £3.81k £9.75k £3.66k £7.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A