Accounts and annual returns KENNETH MAURICE WILLIAMS WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1078971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 August 2020 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 24 August 2020 201 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window