Financial history KENNETH MAURICE WILLIAMS WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1078971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £252.04k £295.73k £307.73k £266.27k £308.05k
Total expenditure £379.26k £429.00k £76.63k £107.34k £591.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A