AFRICAN CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FORUM

Charity number: 1111031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 July 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 February 2021 217 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 February 2021 583 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 01 July 2018 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required