AFRICAN CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FORUM

Charity number: 1111031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £500 £0 £5.00k £6.00k £5.00k
Total expenditure £4.78k £980 £4.50k £4.80k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A