Financial history SOUTH ASIAN DIASPORA LITERATURES AND ARTS ARCHIVE (SALIDAA)

Charity number: 1081584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £13.54k £0 £7.51k £9.79k £32.19k
Total expenditure £24.27k £7.32k £7.77k £5.61k £13.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A