LAW CENTRES FEDERATION

Charity number: 1088588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £739.62k £503.42k £846.58k £1.18m £1.53m
Total expenditure £615.46k £622.35k £849.20k £837.93k £1.68m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £56.49k £56.49k N/A N/A £723.85k
Income - Donations and legacies £78.43k £88.52k £78.31k £423.24k £111.34k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £657.12k £411.88k £740.63k £697.05k £1.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £165 £174 £885 £0 £49
Income - Other £3.91k £2.85k £26.76k £57.12k £23.47k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £597.89k £600.68k £827.81k £815.95k £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.57k £21.67k £21.39k £21.99k £27.21k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £17.83k £0 £13.44k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0