Financial history BEDFORD CENTRAL JAMEE MASJID AND ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1081598
Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/06/2018 12/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £117.34k £123.15k £100.49k £100.21k £157.87k
Total expenditure £65.96k £89.05k £74.91k £47.28k £61.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A