Financial history THE KESWICK CONVENTION TRUST

Charity number: 1083584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.39m £2.01m £3.36m £1.95m £2.23m
Total expenditure £1.67m £1.81m £1.89m £1.07m £1.67m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £31.79k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.09m £1.65m £2.93m £1.73m £1.89m
Income - Other trading activities £42.80k £38.51k £14.09k £24.15k £38.33k
Income - Charitable activities £70.78k £67.39k £72.13k £22.28k £28.02k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £116.62k £177.98k £229.00k £135.47k £203.55k
Income - Other £71.92k £72.09k £16.39k £37.74k £11.48k
Income - Legacies £42.80k £110.61k £10.80k £453.96k £155.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.48m £1.69m £1.71m £888.51k £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £198.12k £124.10k £178.18k £177.90k £196.11k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £14.41k £13.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0