NOAH'S ARK - THE CHILDREN'S HOSPICE

Charity number: 1081156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.03m £2.83m £4.52m £4.66m £6.52m
Total expenditure £1.64m £1.93m £2.53m £2.82m £3.16m
Income from government contracts £0 £124.34k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £124.34k £5.05k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.68m £2.46m £4.07m £4.29m £6.25m
Income - Other trading activities £199.89k £236.29k £266.97k £127.61k £56.72k
Income - Charitable activities £139.97k £129.39k £175.55k £234.93k £199.92k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.34k £6.55k £11.88k £12.98k £6.76k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £136.61k £50.00k £20.97k £151.92k £60.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £780.12k £929.14k £1.44m £1.72m £2.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.00m £1.09m £1.10m £954.12k
Expenditure - Governance £59.70k £0 £61.86k £73.19k £77.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0