NOAH'S ARK - THE CHILDREN'S HOSPICE

Charity number: 1081156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Timms Trustee 29 July 2019 None on record
JEREMY ISAACS CBE Chair
THE J ISAACS CHARITABLE TRUST
Dr Hilary Cass Trustee 27 January 2020 None on record
Dr Jane Hawdon Trustee 29 October 2019
THE ALDENHAM FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr Heather MacKinnon Trustee 25 July 2016 None on record
ADAM LEVIN LLB Trustee 27 March 2017
UKLFI CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Michelle Mendelsson Trustee 05 July 2021 None on record
Paul Pomroy Trustee 05 July 2021 None on record
Sanjiv Patel Trustee 05 July 2021 None on record
Jenny Phillips Trustee 27 April 2020 None on record
Richard Amat Trustee 05 July 2021 None on record