Financial history THE WEST HORSLEY WHEEL OF CARE

Charity number: 1087632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.35k £8.83k £7.50k £1.72k £6.91k
Total expenditure £7.92k £8.07k £7.79k £3.39k £3.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A