Governing document HORSLEY WHEEL OF CARE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/01/2000 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2001 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") IS TO HELP ANY PERSON RESIDING IN THE PARISHES OF EAST AND WEST HORSLEY AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS, WHO IS IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE, BY PROVISION OF TRANSPORT, HOME VISITS OR ANY OTHER HELPFUL OR SUPPORTIVE ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
WEST HORSLEY AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.