Accounts and annual returns HANDSWORTH COMMUNITY GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1082025
Charity reporting is overdue by 1625 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 164 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 164 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 529 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 529 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 894 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 894 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1259 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1259 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1625 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1625 days