Financial history HANDSWORTH COMMUNITY GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1082025
Charity reporting is overdue by 1635 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £114 £887 £1.95k £1.23k £565
Total expenditure £1.85k £781 £1.54k £968 £770
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A