Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MARYS SCHOOL MELLOR

Charity number: 1080520
Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 12 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 12 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required