Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARYS SCHOOL MELLOR

Charity number: 1080520
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £15.47k £15.68k £7.14k £1.67k £9.44k
Total expenditure £6.97k £18.35k £6.83k £4.03k £5.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A