THE INSTITUTE FOR PHILANTHROPY

Charity number: 1093927
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 04 June 2019 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 04 June 2019 35 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 03 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 03 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 29 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 29 March 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)