LIVING GOD'S TEMPLE

Charity number: 1080698
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 April 2021 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 April 2021 78 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 March 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 March 2020 32 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 February 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 February 2019 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 February 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 February 2018 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 June 2017 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 June 2017 124 days late Download