Financial history LIVING GOD'S TEMPLE

Charity number: 1080698
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £67.10k £54.39k £67.39k £38.62k £69.79k
Total expenditure £65.30k £55.93k £54.19k £42.11k £53.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A