Financial history YESHUAS AVRHOM LTD

Charity number: 1080631
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £980.42k £246.08k £219.58k £488.53k £891.49k
Total expenditure £832.37k £232.47k £291.71k £567.20k £562.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £943.34k N/A N/A N/A £797.05k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £37.08k N/A N/A N/A £94.44k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £832.37k N/A N/A N/A £560.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.61k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £622.07k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £1.80k