Trustees The International Medical Education Trust

Charity number: 1081287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Rebecca Julia Shipley Trustee 04 September 2020
None on record
TIMOTHY EDWARD ELLIOTT GOODACRE Trustee 31 July 2019
INTERFACE UGANDA
Received: On time
THE BLOND MCINDOE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT
Received: On time
Rebecca Gabrielle Inglis Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
Sarah Catherine Ewans Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
Dr Omar Abdel-Mannan Trustee 05 January 2019
None on record
Kathryn Green Trustee 05 January 2019
None on record
NICHOLAS DAVID MAYNARD Trustee 16 February 2017
None on record
Dr Hasanen Al-Taiar Trustee 16 February 2017
None on record
PERIHAN BASSATNE Trustee 07 June 2013
RIGHT TO PLAY UK LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr MOHAMMED SADEGHI ALAVIJEH Trustee 07 June 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR BARRY JAMES FULLER Trustee 07 June 2013
None on record