Accounts and annual returns THE HASLEMERE FUND

Charity number: 1109323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 March 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required