FRIENDS OF CHIDDINGFOLD SURGERY

Charity number: 1080617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £55.91k £15.48k £25.73k £14.09k £5.27k
Total expenditure £18.41k £8.73k £16.07k £8.13k £8.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A