THE COMPLETE WORKS LIMITED

Charity number: 1081200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 27 March 2017 On time Download