THE COMPLETE WORKS LIMITED

Charity number: 1081200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.51m £3.48m £3.93m £4.14m £4.29m
Total expenditure £2.13m £2.69m £3.18m £3.92m £4.07m
Income from government contracts £0 £3.48m £3.91m £4.13m £4.27m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.70k £5.16k £15.40k £3.48k £3.43k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.49m £3.48m £3.91m £4.13m £4.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £453 £331 £1.77k £6.19k £11.23k
Income - Other £5.93k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £15.70k £0 £10.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.11m £2.69m £3.18m £3.92m £4.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.14k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.47k £7.44k £11.68k £20.10k £904.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0