Accounts and annual returns SAHARA (COVENTRY) LTD

Charity number: 1086900
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 February 2022 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required