ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1080185
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.46m £1.30m £2.48m £2.50m £2.38m
Total expenditure £1.25m £1.68m £2.37m £2.26m £2.74m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £649.00k £410.00k £1.23m £1.12m £609.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £809.00k £889.00k £1.25m £1.38m £1.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.67m £2.34m £2.22m £2.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £34.00k £15.00k £31.00k £0 £45.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £15.00k £31.00k £45.00k £45.00k