THE ROYAL CORNWALL POLYTECHNIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1081199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £303.94k £349.53k £345.00k £354.74k £373.82k
Total expenditure £344.81k £284.05k £331.98k £354.88k £229.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £41.16k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £41.16k £4.81k N/A £37.45k