THE ROYAL CORNWALL POLYTECHNIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1081199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LAUREN HOGAN Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
JONES OVIAWE Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
Tim Parnell Trustee 18 May 2016 None on record
LOUIS MARK TURNER Trustee 07 May 2014 None on record
VIRGINIA BUTTON Trustee 13 January 2022 None on record
TOM INGATE Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
COLIN MIDSON Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
MARK SMITH Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
Amanda Kim Rundle Trustee 07 May 2014 None on record
Susan Philippa Radmore Chair 13 January 2014 None on record