ALTERNATIVE LINKS FOR TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1084707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2019 15 December 2020 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2018 15 December 2020 678 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2017 03 July 2018 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2016 26 June 2017 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2016 Not Required