TEDBURN ST MARY SPORTS AND RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1084998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 03 April 2021 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2016 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2016 Not Required