TEDBURN ST MARY SPORTS AND RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1084998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 10/02/2016 10/02/2017 10/02/2018 10/02/2019 30/11/2019
Total gross income £3.95k £2.89k £3.70k £8.82k £2.73k
Total expenditure £5.70k £3.45k £3.82k £8.52k £3.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A