CTI 2000

Charity number: 1082428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required