CTI 2000

Charity number: 1082428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.99k £23.16k £20.38k £19.80k £14.52k
Total expenditure £18.92k £20.37k £17.58k £20.04k £10.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.73k £0 £2.73k N/A £3.93k