Financial history THE KATHERINE LOW SETTLEMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 1081248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £669.19k £622.19k £707.41k £1.06m £817.69k
Total expenditure £589.98k £642.28k £724.44k £802.43k £897.36k
Income from government contracts £19.86k N/A £53.81k £98.40k £88.15k
Income from government grants N/A £24.88k N/A £10.49k £28.45k
Income - Donations and legacies £81.36k £93.55k £70.39k £320.99k £193.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £577.89k £516.56k £625.49k £739.68k £618.69k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.31k £3.58k £4.00k £3.05k £3.51k
Income - Other £6.63k £8.49k £7.54k £736 £2.37k
Income - Legacies £0 £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £589.98k £642.28k £724.44k £802.43k £897.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £6.00k £0 £6.00k £6.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0