THE RUSLAND VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1085846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 May 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 March 2021 321 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required