BRIDGWATER OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1089254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £42.71k £43.33k £64.03k £54.86k £18.65k
Total expenditure £26.69k £41.38k £70.50k £42.61k £6.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £10.00k