THE HIGHCREST ACADEMY FUND

Charity number: 1083283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £6.87k £5.44k £4.13k £7.74k £5.19k
Total expenditure £14.01k £11.49k £3.22k £5.54k £2.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A