DEER INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1082289
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £540.17k £517.34k £517.63k £507.19k £389.30k
Total expenditure £495.40k £520.88k £576.45k £533.71k £491.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.00k £0 £309.02k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £400.80k £340.02k £341.75k £309.10k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £16.65k £13.66k £19.39k £8.33k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £180 £203 £200 £249 N/A
Income - Other £122.54k £163.46k £156.29k £189.51k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £485.73k £510.80k £565.21k £523.36k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.67k £10.08k £11.24k £10.35k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £10.16k £16.00k £14.85k £9.54k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A