THE ACADEMY OF ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1087850
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2004 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008
Total gross income £146.81k £734.98k £130.80k £187.20k £80.02k
Total expenditure £140.22k £742.24k £126.73k £177.13k £91.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A