Financial history YMCA SOUTH DEVON

Charity number: 1086783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £461.84k £483.16k £625.81k £498.97k £635.37k
Total expenditure £443.36k £423.85k £552.02k £485.16k £536.61k
Income from government contracts £286.54k £296.08k N/A £420.12k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £15.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £60.48k N/A £86.48k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £10.38k N/A £7.95k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £554.95k N/A £540.94k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £542.86k N/A £505.11k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £9.16k N/A £15.92k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £15.59k