Trustees DAME ALLAN'S SCHOOLS
Charity number: 1084965

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Hamilton Chicken | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Louise Johnson | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Katy Elizabeth Storie | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
William James Lomas | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Taylor | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Vanessa Jane Morrell | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Robson Arthur | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jane Hinson | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY GRAY | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Paes | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Bell | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN JOHN BELSHAM | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.