Financial history CHARLTON PARK SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1081956
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.67k £12.79k £16.70k £15.42k £48
Total expenditure £1.83k £30 £500 £69 £96
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A