ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1082711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time Download