Accounts and annual returns THE LOUISE DA-COCODIA EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1085379
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window