SEFTON O.P.E.R.A.

Charity number: 1086437
Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £187.72k £197.56k £174.92k £124.37k £150.78k
Total expenditure £152.95k £186.94k £195.72k £173.36k £138.17k
Income from government contracts £35.20k £38.71k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £13.13k £28.00k £28.15k £28.15k