ALL AGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1084276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/12/2016 01/12/2017 01/12/2018 01/12/2019 01/12/2020
Total gross income £9.15k £5.27k £2.44k £2.88k £3.26k
Total expenditure £8.96k £5.24k £2.42k £2.81k £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A