Financial history BRESSINGHAM AND FERSFIELD COMMUNITY HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1082541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £11.70k £9.18k £16.47k £34.91k £24.85k
Total expenditure £12.64k £10.36k £6.20k £40.48k £24.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £200
Income from government grants £0 N/A £10.00k £17.91k £200